Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Michael E Michetti, filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case represented by Michetti, Michael E., against Alhaji Diao, Diana Tutien, John Doe A, John Doe B, Marriott International, Inc, (total of 9) See All represented by Brown, Nicole Y, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts Suffolk County Supreme Court with Joseph C Pastoressa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 06, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Defamation) |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
Filing Court HouseSuffolk County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time595 days |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: June 22, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: June 16, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)
Date: July 31, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: June 11, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: June 11, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: June 11, 2020ANSWER
Date: March 13, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: January 08, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) MOTION PART 34 Judge: JOSEPH C. PASTORESSA |
|
October 06, 2020 | Hearing |
OTHER FINAL DISP-PRE NOTE OFFICE PART STD DTD 9/10/20 EFILED 9/25/20 Judge: JOSEPH C. PASTORESSA |
|
September 16, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) MOTION PART 34 PER EF STIP Judge: JOSEPH C. PASTORESSA |
|
August 05, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) MOTION PART 34 PER EF LTR Judge: JOSEPH C. PASTORESSA |
|
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) LETTER TO COURT REQUESTING ADJOURNMENT FOR MOTION 001 REPLY |
|
July 08, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) MOTION PART 34 PER EF STIP Judge: JOSEPH C. PASTORESSA |
|
July 06, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) MOTION PART 34 EFILED Judge: JOSEPH C. PASTORESSA |
|
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Stipulation to Adjourn |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) *Corrected* Notice of Motion |
|
June 16, 2020 | Motion |
CHANGE VENUE (Motion #001) Decided: 10/14/2020MOTION WITHDRAWN Before Justice: JOSEPH C. PASTORESSA Answer demanded: No Judge: JOSEPH C. PASTORESSA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.