Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Thomas O'Donoghue, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Delcol, Robert James, against Tricia O'Donoghue, represented by Goldman, Brian Scott, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts with Robert F Quinlan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert F Quinlan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 26, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 25, 2023ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 13, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: October 25, 2023ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: November 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 13, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: November 13, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 25, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 25, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 25, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: October 08, 2023SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: July 26, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: September 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2023 |
ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #001) Signed Order - 11/21/23 |
||
November 28, 2023 |
ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #002) Signed Order - 11/21/23 |
||
November 20, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support of Motion and in Opposition to Cross-Motion |
||
November 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #002) Criminal Record |
||
November 13, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION | ||
November 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #002) |
||
November 13, 2023 | NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION | ||
October 25, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint |
||
October 25, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Attorney Del Col's Affirmation dated 7/16/23 |
||
October 25, 2023 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.