Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ipfs Of New York, Llc, A Subsidiary Of Ipfs Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Speed, Mark D, against Necg Inc., D B A Northeast Construction Group, represented by Block, Justin Matthew, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts with Kathy G Bergmann presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathy G Bergmann Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 30, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: November 16, 2022ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: August 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 09, 2022ANSWER
Date: November 02, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: April 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: August 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 09, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 08, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 09, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: April 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 09, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 09, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 09, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 09, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: April 12, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 09, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: April 12, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: January 26, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: March 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2023 |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) Proposed P.C. Order |
||
January 26, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
November 16, 2022 |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Plaintiff's First Notice For Discovery and Inspection |
||
November 16, 2022 | Notice of Deposition of Defendant | ||
April 29, 2022 |
ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #001) dated 4-27-2022 |
||
April 29, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
April 29, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 18, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) Reply Affidavit In Support of Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment |
||
April 12, 2022 | STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS | ||
April 12, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.