Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ferda Gumus, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Yahya Kemal Gumus, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts with Caren Loguercio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCaren Loguercio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
June 21, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
June 21, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 22, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
March 21, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | ||
March 10, 2022 | NYS CASE REGISTRY FILING FORM | ||
March 10, 2022 | UCS - 111 | ||
January 26, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
January 26, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW (PROPOSED) | ||
January 26, 2022 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.