Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
County Of Suffolk, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Azzato, Lisa, against Benimax, Inc., Kris D Lyne Contracting Corp., Kristine Raffetto, Ljm Gardens, Llc, Louise Privitera, (total of 8) See All represented by Allen, Brian Francis, Cohn, Steven, Smith, Christopher A., Stamboulidis, George, Zelin, Randy Scott, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts Suffolk County Supreme Court with Stephen L. Braslow presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 20, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Nuisance,Trespass) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuffolk County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time477 days |
STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: January 16, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 09, 2019STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: December 03, 2018STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 16, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: December 10, 2018STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: April 09, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: August 20, 2018STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: September 26, 2018STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: December 03, 2018STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: December 10, 2019ANSWER
Date: October 31, 2018STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: October 19, 2018STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: February 15, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 24, 2018STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: April 08, 2019STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: October 04, 2018STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: June 17, 2019STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: September 24, 2018RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 25, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 24, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 09, 2019STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 24, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 26, 2018STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: August 12, 2019STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: January 08, 2019STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: October 25, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 25, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 24, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: December 10, 2018STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: January 10, 2019ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 10, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 26, 2018STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: October 31, 2018SUMMONS
Date: August 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C plea agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D kris/d/lyne plea agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 20, 2018NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: August 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 25, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E LJM Gardens plea agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 26, 2018ADMISSION OF SERVICE
Date: September 26, 2018ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST
Date: October 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 09, 2019ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST
Date: September 19, 2019ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST
Date: September 12, 2019NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: December 10, 2019ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST
Date: October 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 24, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - OTHER | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | |
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) Notice of Withdrawal of Motion of Defendants Benimax, Inc. and Stanley Morobito to Dismiss the Verif Notice of Withdrawal of Motion of Defendants Benimax, Inc. and Stanley Morobito to Dismiss the Verif ... show more |
|
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST (Motion #002) Request to adjourn 10/11/19 Motions and Conference to 11/20/19 |
|
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST Request to adjourn 10/11/19 Conference to 11/20/19 |
|
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST Request to adjourn 10/11/19 Motions and Conference |
|
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance as to Defendants Stanley Morabito & Benimax, Inc. |
|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST Request to adjourn 9/20/19 Conference to 10/11/19 |
|
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST Request to adjourn 9/13/19 conference for civil and criminal proceeding to 9/20/19 |
|
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - OTHER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.