Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
John H Meyer Iii, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Palermo, Steven Joseph, against Jan G Williams, Port Jefferson Cesspool Service, Inc., represented by Callahan, Sean Christopher, Mejia, Dennise E., in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts with Joseph A Santorelli presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph A Santorelli Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 20, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 20, 2023RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 25, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 25, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 25, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 25, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 20, 2023NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: November 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 20, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 25, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 25, 2024STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 20, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 20, 2023ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR
Date: September 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 20, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 25, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 25, 2024STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 25, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 20, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 20, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 17, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 19, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: July 19, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 19, 2023ADMISSION OF SERVICE Notice Pursuant to Section 306-C of CPLR Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 02, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: August 29, 2023BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: August 29, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 07, 2023ANSWER
Date: July 19, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 29, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2024 |
RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #001) Response to SOMF |
||
January 25, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Defendants' Answer |
||
January 25, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Affidavit |
||
January 25, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Police Report |
||
January 25, 2024 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #001) Memo of Law in Opposition |
||
January 25, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Counsel in Opposition |
||
January 25, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Plaintiff's VBOP |
||
January 25, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint |
||
January 25, 2024 |
STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #001) SOMF |
||
December 20, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #001) Memorandum of Law |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.