Case Last Refreshed: 17 hours ago
Nancy Delvecchio, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Picarello, Brian Anthony, against Salvatore Delvecchio, represented by Macedonio, Robert Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts Supreme with Deborah Poulos presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDeborah Poulos Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2024 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #2) | ||
April 01, 2024 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #2) | ||
March 29, 2024 | EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) | ||
March 29, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #2) | ||
March 29, 2024 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) | ||
December 05, 2023 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
December 01, 2023 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | ||
December 01, 2023 | QUALIFIED MEDICAL CHILD SUPPORT ORDER | ||
October 23, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT | ||
October 03, 2023 | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.