Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Bernadeta Jablonska, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Brenecki, Nicole, Jodre, Jordan Adam, against Jaroslaw Choromanski, Rarytas Deli, Inc., represented by Giampilis, Michael P, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts with George Nolan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeorge Nolan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
ANSWER
Date: August 13, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 03, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 13, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 03, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: January 06, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 03, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 15, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: January 04, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 25, 2021ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: August 25, 2021NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: August 27, 2021ANSWER
Date: August 13, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
March 03, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
January 06, 2022 |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) Filed pursuant to the Court Referee's directives at the January 6, 2022 conference |
||
January 04, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 15, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: Plaintiff's Second Notice for Discovery and Inspection to Defendants |
||
November 03, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: Plaintiff's Notice for Discovery and Inspection to Defendants |
||
November 03, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: Notice to take Deposition of Defendants |
||
August 27, 2021 | NOTIFICATION FROM COURT | ||
August 25, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
August 25, 2021 | ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.