Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee For Bnc Mortgage Loan Trust 2007-1 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-1, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Di Caro, John A, against Candice Lewis Administratrix To The Estate Of Perry Lewis, Candice Lewis Administratrix To The Estate Of Perry Lewis, Clerk Of The Suffolk County District Court, Clerk Of The Suffolk County Traffic & Parking Violations Agency, Ge Capital Apo Lvnv Funding, Llc, (total of 14) See All represented by Murphy, Kathleen Marie, Somma, Donna Marie, Weiss, Ronald D., in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts with Paul M Hensley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul M Hensley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 15, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
John Doe #1 Through John Doe #12, The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Subject Property Described In The Complaint
AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service by Mail Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002) Notice of Default Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 05, 2023SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 05, 2023SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 05, 2023SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002) Assignment of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 05, 2023HARDSHIP DECLARATION
Date: July 14, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 28, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2021ANSWER
Date: July 29, 2021STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: July 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Hardship Affidavit Exhibit A Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 15, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 29, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 09, 2021ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 29, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 01, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES
Date: June 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #002) Affidavit of Military Status Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 09, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 26, 2023NOTICE TO DEFENDANT (PER AO-131-20)
Date: June 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Complaint Exhibits Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 15, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT)
Date: June 15, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #002) Death Certificate Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 05, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002) 90-day Notice Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 05, 2023REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: August 18, 2021CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: June 15, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 05, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 29, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2021ORDER - APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002) Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Certificate of Merit Exhibits Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: June 15, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 29, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 29, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002) Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 05, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002) Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001) Affidavits of Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 29, 2022ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: March 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002) Loan Modification Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 05, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: March 29, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: July 29, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2023 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) MOT SEQ 002 DENIED |
||
April 05, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service by Mail Redacted per 22 NYCRR Affidavit of Service by Mail Redacted |
||
April 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #002) Power of Attorney |
||
April 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #002) Notice of Appearance and Waiver |
||
April 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #002) Answer |
||
April 05, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002) Affidavit of Indebtedness |
||
April 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Notice of Default Redacted per 22 NYCRR Notice of Default Redacted |
||
April 05, 2023 |
SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION (Motion #002) Printing Specifications Statement |
||
April 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR Affidavit of Service Redacted |
||
April 05, 2023 |
SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION (Motion #002) Statement of Undisputed Material Facts |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.