Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Nicholas Dassler, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Pagliarello, Gary, against Daniel B. Kremen, Golden Hawk Llc, represented by Hosty, Jaclyn C., in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts with Linda Kevins presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLinda Kevins Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 11, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 11, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 25, 2021ANSWER
Date: October 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 07, 2021NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: November 15, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 26, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: December 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: December 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: February 04, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 02, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 26, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001) Police Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 25, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 07, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 18, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 12, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: May 09, 2022STIPULATION - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: May 12, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 01, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 03, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 02, 2022STIPULATION - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: May 16, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: May 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 03, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: August 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 01, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 10, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED
Date: January 11, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: January 10, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: January 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: January 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 10, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 17, 2023NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: January 17, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED
Date: January 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: January 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 27, 2023ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 10, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter Judge Goldstein on Appellate Division/Second Dept. |
||
February 10, 2023 |
ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #002) REFERRAL ORDER FROM JUDGE KEVINS TO DCM JUSTICE |
||
January 27, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 18, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED | ||
January 17, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | ||
January 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons & Complaint |
||
January 17, 2023 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
January 17, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
January 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Notice Letter |
||
January 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.