Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Barbara Dobbs, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Fils-Aime, Steve, Hargis, Erin Marie, Harris, Vivian R, Zhu, Michael H., against Suffolk County Water Authority, Village Of Patchogue, represented by Besen, Stuart Paul, Mcelhenny, Brian W., Morgillo, Kenneth Robert, Moro, Kristin Nicole, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts with Ccp Justice presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 04, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Trip And Fall) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 04, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 04, 2020ANSWER
Date: September 11, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 11, 2020ANSWER
Date: August 25, 2020DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: September 11, 2020NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 11, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 13, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 13, 2020AFFIRMATION
Date: February 16, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 25, 2020STIPULATION - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: July 06, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 29, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: February 16, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: June 25, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 16, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 29, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 14, 2021NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: September 28, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 28, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 29, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: March 16, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 30, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 06, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: July 07, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: February 15, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: February 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001) Plaintiff's License Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 28, 2023NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: February 22, 2023ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 04, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: May 04, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 08, 2023RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 08, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: September 08, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 22, 2023MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 22, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 28, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #002) Village Response to Post-EBT Demand
Date: June 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 22, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 22, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: June 22, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 22, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: July 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
September 15, 2023 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF HEARING Stipulation to Adjourn Motions |
||
September 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #004) EX 6 - July 2018 google street view screen capture |
||
September 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #002) EX 7 - November 2019 google street view screen capture |
||
September 08, 2023 | RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS | ||
September 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #002) EX 5 - September 2017 google street view screen capture |
||
September 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #004) Ex 1 - Proposed amended notice of claim |
||
September 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #004) EX 2 - Proposed amended complaint |
||
September 08, 2023 | NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION | ||
September 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #004) EX 7 - November 2019 google street view screen capture |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.