Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Flushing Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Dell'Amore, Frank C, against 28 Sawgrass Dr Llc, Agc Machine Corporation, Gladys F. Carlesso, Guillermo J. Carlesso, John Doe No. I To John Doe No. Xxx, Inclusive, The Last Thirty Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises Described In The Complaint,, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2024 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Commercial |
Last RefreshedMarch 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a commercial mortgage foreclosure action filed by Flushing Bank against 28 Sawgrass DR LLC, AGC Machine Corporation, the New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, Gladys F. Carlesso, and Guillermo J. Carlesso. Flushing Bank...
EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Unconditional Guarantee Agreements dated May 19, 2021 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 23, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 11, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Letter dated December 11, 2023 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 23, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 18, 2024NOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT)
Date: February 28, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Forbearance Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 23, 2024SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: February 23, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint Served Upon John Doe No. I a/k/a Precision Machining |
||
March 11, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint Served Upon New York State Department of Taxation and Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint Served Upon New York State Department of Taxation and ... show more |
||
March 11, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint Served Upon AGC Machine Corporation |
||
March 11, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint Served Upon 28 Sawgrass Dr LLC |
||
February 28, 2024 |
NOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT) Notice of Pendency |
||
February 23, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G Unconditional Guarantee Agreements dated May 19, 2021 Redacted per 22 NYCRR Unconditional Guarantee Agreements dated May 19, 2021 Redacted |
||
February 23, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F Letter notifying Borrowers and Guarantors of the acceleration Redacted per 22 NYCRR Letter notifying Borrowers and Guarantors of the acceleration Redacted |
||
February 23, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Letter dated December 11, 2023 Redacted per 22 NYCRR Letter dated December 11, 2023 Redacted |
||
February 23, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Legal Description of Property |
||
February 23, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Forbearance Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR Forbearance Agreement Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.