Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee To J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corp. 2005-Fre1 Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates. Series 2005-Fre1, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., Hartley, Adam Patrick, Lazar, Steven, Weiss, Ronald D., against Bristol Associates Ltd, Clerk Of The Suffolk County Traffic & Parking Violations Agency, Fremont Investment & Loan, Haider Hussain, John Doe 1-John Doe 12 The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff,The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corps, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Subject Property, Described In The Com, (total of 8) See All represented by Borg, Jonathan M, Weiss, Ronald D., in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts Suffolk County Supreme Court with HOWARD HECKMAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 06, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseSuffolk County Supreme Court |
INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 23, 2019REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: May 13, 2019ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 23, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 06, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 29, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 05, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 22, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 19, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 29, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 19, 2019ANSWER
Date: April 11, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 19, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: July 22, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 06, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 16, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 08, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 23, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 08, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 16, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 05, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 16, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 19, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 19, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 16, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 24, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 08, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 23, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 19, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: August 06, 2020RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: May 23, 2019ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: May 23, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 13, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 11, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 30, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: May 07, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 19, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 19, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 19, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 19, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 19, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: November 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 17, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 10, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 21, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2019CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 06, 2019NOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT)
Date: March 06, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 19, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: December 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 29, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: March 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: November 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 17, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 17, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 21, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 29, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #001) 2011 Loan Modification Agreement
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 17, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 17, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020HARDSHIP DECLARATION RETURNED (UNDELIVERABLE)
Date: March 02, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 17, 2021NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: January 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: October 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: March 17, 2021HARDSHIP DECLARATION
Date: March 12, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT)
Date: February 28, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: March 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 17, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: March 17, 2021ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 20, 2022ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 20, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 30, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 27, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 27, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #003) Notice of Supplemental Authority |
||
December 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #003) eCourts |
||
December 27, 2022 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #003) Memorandum of Law in Opposition |
||
December 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #003) Unreported & Unpublished Decisions |
||
December 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #003) Kessler 90-day notice |
||
November 18, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Exhibit A |
||
November 18, 2022 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Appeal and Request for Appellate Division Intervention |
||
November 18, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #003) Affirmation in Support |
||
November 18, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #003) Affidavit in Support |
||
November 18, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003) Notice of Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.