Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
U.S. Bank National Association, Not In Its Individual Capacity But Solely As Trustee For The Rmac Trust, Series 2016-Ctt, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Knuckles, Mark R., Komosinski, Richard F, Levithan, Louis Anthony, Manfro, Jordan Jayce, Olson, Karen B., (total of 5) See All against Eric H. Lieck, Jama Cap Llc, John Doe Number One Through John Doe Number Ten, Karla L. Mccomb, Nelson Poalacin, (total of 10) See All represented by Cannava, Ernest John, Frommer, Robert W, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts with Paul M Hensley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
COMPLAINT
Date: March 02, 2022SUMMONS WITH NOTICE (FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID)
Date: March 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: February 28, 2022SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)
Date: March 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: March 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: March 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: March 21, 2022COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: March 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: March 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: March 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: March 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 27, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: October 16, 2023NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: November 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 06, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 24, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2022NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: April 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: February 28, 2022NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK - AMENDMENT OF CAPTION
Date: April 19, 2022ANSWER
Date: April 21, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES
Date: April 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 22, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 21, 2022TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: August 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: February 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: February 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: February 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: February 28, 2022CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: February 28, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT)
Date: February 28, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 02, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9
Date: November 04, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: July 21, 2023NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION
Date: June 09, 2023ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: October 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: November 04, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 11, 2023ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: January 18, 2023COPY OF SUBPOENA
Date: June 13, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 11, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 08, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 27, 2023ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: November 04, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10
Date: November 04, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 18, 2023COPY OF SUBPOENA
Date: June 09, 2023NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION
Date: June 13, 2023ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: August 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: November 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: November 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: November 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8
Date: November 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: November 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: November 04, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 04, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 03, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 29, 2022ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: November 04, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 24, 2022REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: May 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 06, 2022RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: May 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: July 06, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2022ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: May 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 16, 2022ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: May 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: May 09, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2022ANSWER
Date: May 09, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2022NOTICE OF REJECTION
Date: May 11, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 09, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2022SUMMONS (COUNTERCLAIM / CROSSCLAIM - CPLR 3019)
Date: May 11, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2022NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: April 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 27, 2023 |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY Note of Issue - Certificate of Readiness - Order |
||
October 16, 2023 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE File Note of Issue by 12/1/23 |
||
October 05, 2023 |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING SFO AFTER CONFERENCE |
||
September 21, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Joint Discovery Letter |
||
August 11, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Jama Cap LLC Certification of Business Records Pursuant to CPLR 3122-a |
||
August 09, 2023 |
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS Transcript dated July 17, 2023 |
||
July 21, 2023 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Paul M. Hensley, AJSC |
||
July 21, 2023 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Patrial Discontinuance of Action again Defendant Jama Cap LLC |
||
July 18, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Joint Status Letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.