Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Carrington Mortgage Services, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Di Caro, John A, against John Doe, Said Name Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants Of Premises Being Foreclosed Herein, And Any Parties, Corporations Or Entities, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises, Joseph Borozny, Suzanne Borozny A K A Suzanne Penny Borozny, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts Suffolk County Supreme Court with Robert F Quinlan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseSuffolk County Supreme Court |
COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 19, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 24, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 28, 2019ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: March 28, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 12, 2019NOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT)
Date: February 19, 2019CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: February 19, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 28, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 23, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 28, 2019NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: January 27, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 24, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT)
Date: January 19, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 29, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 06, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 28, 2022ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: June 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #001) Affidavit of Merit & Amount Due Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001) Military Status Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 24, 2022RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: March 28, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001) Notice of Default Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 24, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 24, 2022FORECLOSURE -SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INELIGIBLE AFFIRMATION
Date: January 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001) 90-Day Notice Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 24, 2022SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: February 19, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 24, 2022NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C)
Date: December 05, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 23, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service by Mail |
||
December 07, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) Notice of Motion to Discontinue Action |
||
December 07, 2022 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002) Order Canceling Lis Pendens and Discontinuing Action |
||
December 07, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #002) Affirmation |
||
December 05, 2022 | NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C) | ||
September 28, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) status |
||
June 09, 2022 | ORDER - REFERENCE | ||
June 06, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) withdraw |
||
March 29, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) adjournment letter |
||
January 24, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion for a Default Judgment & Order of Reference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.