Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc D B A Mr. Cooper, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Akarah, Amanie, Gazzo, Nicole Carol, Grubea, Jessica Joy, Heaney, Alexandra Rose, Hyman, Sarah Kristin, (total of 9) See All against Choyce Hardin, Clerk Of The Suffolk County Traffic & Parking Violations Agency, Michael Paterno, Robin S Paterno Aka Robin Paterno, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts Suffolk County Supreme Court with John H Rouse presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions339 days |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseSuffolk County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time286 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 10, 2019AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY
Date: September 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 10, 2019BILL OF COSTS
Date: September 10, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 15, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 02, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 10, 2019ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: May 06, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 10, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 07, 2019NOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 19, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001) Certificate of Merit Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 10, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 06, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 10, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 07, 2019NOTICE OF SALE
Date: March 13, 2020CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 19, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 08, 2019RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: May 06, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001) Department of Defense Search results Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 10, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 01, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 11, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 07, 2019AFFIDAVIT Non Military Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 04, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 24, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 10, 2021NOTICE OF SALE
Date: April 19, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 29, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001) Notice of Pendency Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001) Affidavits of Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 10, 2019STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: September 08, 2022NOTICE OF SALE
Date: November 02, 2022FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: February 08, 2023REFEREE REPORT OF SALE
Date: February 22, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 01, 2019JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: December 30, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 10, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 06, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 19, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2023 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
February 08, 2023 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
November 02, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 02, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
September 15, 2022 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Stipulation Terminating Memorandum of Sale |
||
September 08, 2022 |
STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Stipulation Vacating Sale |
||
April 19, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
March 29, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
September 10, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
November 04, 2020 | Hearing |
SALE CANCELLED FIDUCIARY CLERK OFFICE FINAL C FSD:4/8/20 Judge: JOHN H. ROUSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.