Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
State Of New York, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Rago, Anne Marie, against Jorge Ramirez, represented by Hassberg, Linda R., in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts Suffolk County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuffolk County Supreme Court |
COMPLAINT
Date: July 09, 2019STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: March 11, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 05, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 19, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER THIRD STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT |
|
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | |
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS WITH NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.