Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
J.G. Wentworth Originations, Llc, filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Transfer Struct. Settlmnt) case represented by Calder, Linda Doyle, Taitz, Steven Carter, against New York Life Insurance And Annuity Corporation, New York Life Insurance Company, Robert Selby, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts Suffolk County Supreme Court with Sanford N. Berland presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2019 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Transfer Struct. Settlmnt) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseSuffolk County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time146 days |
RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: February 19, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: July 15, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: July 15, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 15, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 04, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #001)
Date: February 21, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: February 19, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)
Date: February 19, 2019PETITION
Date: February 19, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | |
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
July 15, 2019 | Hearing |
DISPOSED/RESULT OF A MOTION HEARING PART 6 HEARING HELD Judge: SANFORD N. BERLAND |
|
June 06, 2019 | Hearing |
HEARING CONTINUE HEARING PART 6 @ 2 P.M. Judge: SANFORD N. BERLAND |
|
May 09, 2019 | Hearing |
HEARING CONTINUE HEARING PART 6 @ 10 A.M. Judge: SANFORD N. BERLAND |
|
March 26, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) MOTION PART 6 OSC Judge: SANFORD N. BERLAND |
|
March 20, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) MOTION PART 6 PIC OSC Judge: SANFORD N. BERLAND |
|
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A to Proposed Order - Infant's Compromise Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.