Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Freedom Mortgage Corporation, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Caster, Austin Robert, Polowy, Amy E., against Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., As Nominee For Freedom Mortgage Corporation, Shawn Wilson, Amberly Wilson, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts Suffolk County Supreme Court with John H Rouse presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Contract (Non-Commercial)) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseSuffolk County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time262 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - VACATE Vacate Satisfaction Mortgage |
|
September 11, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) EXPARTE ORDER EFILED Judge: JOHN H. ROUSE |
|
September 09, 2019 | Motion |
VACATE SATISFACTION MORTGAGE (Motion #001) Decided: 11/07/2019CASE DISPOSED Before Justice: JOHN H. ROUSE Answer demanded: No Judge: JOHN H. ROUSE |
|
September 09, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) EXPARTE ORDER EFILED Judge: JOHN H. ROUSE |
|
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION | |
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Affidavit |
|
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Affidavits of Service |
|
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint |
|
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | |
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.