Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Queenie Vieux, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Linder, Mark, against Costco Wholesale Corporation, represented by Giordano, Louis Patrick, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts Suffolk County Supreme Court with George Nolan presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management301 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Personal Injury) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseSuffolk County Supreme Court |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: November 29, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 26, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 27, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 10, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 19, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 19, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 20, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 26, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: August 29, 2019ANSWER
Date: February 26, 2019ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR
Date: December 17, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 26, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 26, 2019AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 29, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 26, 2019RJI -RE: OTHER *Corrected*
Date: July 26, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: February 26, 2019ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: August 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 25, 2021NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: April 14, 2020PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: October 09, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 27, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 29, 2019NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: November 20, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 30, 2021STIPULATION - AMENDING PLEADING(S)
Date: August 11, 2021SUMMONS (POST RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: August 17, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 26, 2019COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: August 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 25, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 18, 2021 |
ANSWER (AMENDED) Verified Answer to Amended Complaint and Combined Discovery Demands |
||
August 17, 2021 | SUMMONS (POST RJI) (AMENDED) | ||
August 17, 2021 | COMPLAINT (AMENDED) | ||
August 11, 2021 |
STIPULATION - AMENDING PLEADING(S) To be So Ordered |
||
January 06, 2021 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONF PART 55 CHRE Judge: GEORGE M. NOLAN |
|
November 20, 2020 |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice for Discovery and Inspection |
||
November 19, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED COMPLIANCE CONF PART 55 CHRE Judge: GEORGE M. NOLAN |
|
October 06, 2020 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD COMPLIANCE CONF PART 55 CHRE FROM ADR Judge: GEORGE M. NOLAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.