Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Marc Ingrassia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Rosenthal, Fred Robert, Tang, Denny, against Amanda Santiago, represented by Kartzinel, Steven Roy, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts Suffolk County Supreme Court with Robert F Quinlan presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management225 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseSuffolk County Supreme Court |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: May 06, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 19, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 25, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 28, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: June 12, 2020ANSWER
Date: March 28, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 15, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: May 06, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001)
Date: July 15, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 22, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) MOTION PART 27 PERCHMB 7/15 STIP PERCHMB Judge: ROBERT F. QUINLAN |
|
October 20, 2020 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONF PART 27 1:00 PM PHONE Judge: ROBERT F. QUINLAN |
|
September 24, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) MOTION PART 27 PERCHMB 7/15 STIP PERCHMB Judge: ROBERT F. QUINLAN |
|
September 14, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED COMPLIANCE CONF PART 27 VIRTUAL- 11:00AM Judge: ROBERT F. QUINLAN |
|
August 13, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) MOTION PART 27 PERCHMB 7/15 STIP PERCHMB Judge: ROBERT F. QUINLAN |
|
July 17, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED COMPLIANCE CONF PART 27 VIRTUAL 12:30PM Judge: ROBERT F. QUINLAN |
|
July 16, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) MOTION PART 27 PERCHMB 7/15 STIP PERCHMB Judge: ROBERT F. QUINLAN |
|
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001) | |
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001) | |
July 15, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) MOTION PART 27 EFILE DOC #19 PERCHMB Judge: ROBERT F. QUINLAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.