Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Cesar Rodriguez, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kunkis, Roger M., against Helen Fitzsimons, represented by Quinn, Maureen, Weinman, Carol Ann, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts Suffolk County Supreme Court with William G Ford presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management147 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseSuffolk County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time294 days |
DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 01, 2019STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 09, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 01, 2019ANSWER
Date: May 01, 2019ANSWER
Date: May 01, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 19, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2019 | Hearing |
OTHER FINAL DISP-PRE NOTE COMPLIANCE CONF PART 38 Judge: WILLIAM G. FORD |
|
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
December 01, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED COMPLIANCE CONF PART 38 Judge: WILLIAM G. FORD |
|
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
July 16, 2019 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD PRELIMINARY CONF PART DCM 10:00AM RM338 Judge: DCM-JUSTICE |
|
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | |
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR: Defendants Combined Demands on Plaintiff |
|
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.