Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shur, Joseph M, against R. Hutchinson A K A R.G. Hutchinson Jr. A K A Robert Hutchinson, represented by Attorney Opted Out Of Efiling, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts Suffolk County Supreme Court with Joseph A Santorelli presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court HouseSuffolk County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 11, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 19, 2019ANSWER
Date: March 20, 2019ANSWER
Date: March 27, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: March 12, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: December 27, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: January 03, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 13, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT of Non-military service |
|
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | BILL OF COSTS | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | |
February 17, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
February 17, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
February 06, 2020 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #001) MOTION PART 10 PIP Judge: JOSEPH A. SANTORELLI |
|
February 05, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) MOTION PART 10 EFILE Judge: JOSEPH A. SANTORELLI |
|
January 03, 2020 | Motion |
SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #001) Decided: 02/11/2020CASE DISPOSED Before Justice: JOSEPH A. SANTORELLI Answer demanded: No Judge: JOSEPH A. SANTORELLI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.