Case Last Refreshed: 7 hours ago
Christopher Mercogliano A K A Christopher Liano, Nailati Holdings, Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Pittman, Barry V., against Arc Holdings, Llc, Cardino & Company, Attorneys At Law, Frank Cardino Esq., Nailati Holdings, Llc, Richard Sapiena Jr., (total of 7) See All represented by Compono, Samantha, O'Brien, Paul Michael, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts Supreme with JERRY GARGUILO presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2019 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
|
Last RefreshedJune 16, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time231 days |
This complaint alleges that the defendants, including Nailati Holdings, Richard Sapienza Jr., Richard Sapienza III, Tepedino & Company LLP, Cardino & Cardino Attorneys at Law, Frank Cardino, and ARC Holdings, engaged in fraudulent activities and fail...
EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 26, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 26, 2019NOTICE
Date: April 30, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 26, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 08, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #001) Prior exhibit including chase bank account statements
Date: August 26, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 28, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 08, 2019CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 26, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 26, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 26, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 26, 2019CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: February 19, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 28, 2019SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: February 28, 2019ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 26, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 03, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: February 19, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 26, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 26, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 26, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 28, 2019SUMMONS
Date: February 19, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 10, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 26, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 26, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 28, 2019ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 26, 2019STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: May 14, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) | |
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
August 28, 2019 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #001) MOTION PART 48 Judge: JERRY GARGUILO/COMM |
|
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) | |
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #001) | |
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #001) Prior exhibit including chase bank account statements Prior exhibit including chase bank account statements Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
|
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #001) Checks payable to RS III |
|
July 10, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) MOTION PART 48 Judge: JERRY GARGUILO/COMM |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Affidavit of Christopher Mercogliano |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Closing Statement 64-66 Park |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.