Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
R. T. A Minor, By And Through His Mother And Natural Guardian Kristin R. Thoden, Ryan Thoden, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Shalom, Jonathan, against Hub Truck Rental Corp, K&B Quality Services Inc, Major League Transportation Llc, R. M. Paradazelya, represented by Organek, Megan Furrer, Patzelt-Russo, Melissa Danielle, Schwartz, Bryan T., in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts with Vincent J. Martorana presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVincent J. Martorana Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: December 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 02, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: January 03, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 02, 2023NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: January 15, 2024SUMMONS (POST RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: October 12, 2023REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: January 24, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 21, 2023ANSWER
Date: December 28, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 07, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: October 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 02, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 02, 2023NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK - AMENDMENT OF CAPTION
Date: September 11, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 29, 2023STIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION
Date: August 29, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 12, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: August 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 23, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 23, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 23, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 23, 2023ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR
Date: July 11, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 18, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 01, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 01, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 14, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 31, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: May 03, 2023NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: June 19, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: May 03, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 31, 2023ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: June 01, 2023SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)
Date: May 03, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: June 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2024 |
REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S) REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIMS OF CO-DEFENDANTS |
||
January 15, 2024 |
NOTICE TO ADMIT Upon Major League Transportation, LLC |
||
January 03, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
December 28, 2023 |
ANSWER To Amended Complaint |
||
December 21, 2023 |
ANSWER (AMENDED) Answer to Amended Verified Complaint with Cross Claims |
||
December 21, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Initial Discovery Demands |
||
December 21, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: NOTICE FOR DISCOVERY & INSPECTION DIRECTED AT CO-DEFENDANTS |
||
November 02, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Exhibit C- Amended Pleadings and Affidavit of Service |
||
November 02, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit A- Court Order |
||
November 02, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.