Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Brady Risk Environmental, Llc, Eliot Bloom, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Negron, Raymond Dennis, against Eileen Alcus, Environmental Sewer And Drain, Inc., Mjt Properties, Inc., Patricia Alcus, represented by Lockwood, Scott C., in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts Suffolk County Supreme Court with Denise F. Molia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Replevin) |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuffolk County Supreme Court |
ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: February 10, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: May 08, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: May 07, 2020ANSWER
Date: March 03, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: May 04, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: May 04, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 18, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: May 04, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2020 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #001) MOTION PART 39 PIP Judge: DENISE F. MOLIA |
|
May 08, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) MOTION PART 39 Judge: DENISE F. MOLIA |
|
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) | |
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) Plaintiff Reply |
|
May 07, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) MOTION PART 39 Judge: DENISE F. MOLIA |
|
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) AO 87/20 |
|
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Administrative Order 78/20 |
|
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) EO 202.18 |
|
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) EO 202.14 |
|
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Executive Order 202.8 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.