Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ecarg N Oil, Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Brandimarte, Luigi, against I. A., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Property And Casualty Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts with David T Reilly presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2021 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Sale/Transfer) |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 08, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 26, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 05, 2021ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM
Date: March 25, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Payee (Overnight)
Date: March 05, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 16, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 05, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)
Date: January 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: January 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: January 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: February 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: January 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: January 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 08, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 08, 2021PETITION
Date: January 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
March 26, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 25, 2021 | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM | ||
March 05, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Via Regular Mail |
||
March 05, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Payee (Overnight) Payee (Overnight) Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
March 05, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Order with Notice of Hearing |
||
February 16, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
February 16, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
February 16, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
January 08, 2021 | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.