Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Citimortgage, Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Rogers, Heather C, against John Doe, Mark J. Mcglone, Mary Doe, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts Suffolk County Supreme Court with John H Rouse presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1242 days |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseSuffolk County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1557 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: September 14, 2015JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: May 26, 2017EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: July 07, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 15, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #001)
Date: September 14, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 31, 2013NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: September 14, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 18, 2014LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: June 16, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001)
Date: September 14, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2018 | Hearing |
FORECLOSURE/FORM RECEIVED FIDUCIARY CLERK OFFICE NO SURPLUS 11/27/17 S/240,000 U/491,279 Judge: JOHN H. ROUSE |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
REFEREE REPORT OF SALE Referee's Report of Sale, Affidavit of Mailing, Affidavit of Posting, Memorandum & Terms of Sale |
|
November 27, 2017 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | |
September 07, 2017 | Hearing |
PD - ADJOURNED FORECLOSURE SALE DATE Judge: JOHN H. ROUSE |
|
June 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry - Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale | |
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | |
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
May 26, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | |
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT) Redacted |
|
October 26, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #002) EXPARTE ORDER Judge: JOHN H. ROUSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.