Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Thomas Massey As Administrator Of The Estate Of Judy Massey And Thomas Massey, Individually, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Essner, Howard, Kobin, Jason Marc, against Bhumika Patel Md, Courtney Stengal Md, Ernst Raeder Md, Farmingville Family Medicine, Island Urgent Medical Care, P.C., (total of 11) See All represented by Benvenuto, Thomas J, Bracken, Anne Margaret, Johs, Frederick C., Semmig, Heidelind Marta, Simmons, Mario Earl, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts Suffolk County Supreme Court with JERRY GARGUILO presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management170 days |
|
Filing DateJune 25, 2014 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseSuffolk County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1825 days |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: February 01, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 15, 2016STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: February 03, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 03, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 10, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 24, 2019STIPULATION - OTHER *Corrected*
Date: April 27, 2015ANSWER
Date: August 22, 2014ANSWER
Date: September 08, 2014ANSWER
Date: August 27, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 25, 2014STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 24, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 17, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 17, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 17, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 06, 2016ANSWER
Date: July 22, 2014STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 24, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE WITH PREJUDICE |
|
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) NO FEE AUTHORIZATION LETTER |
|
February 13, 2018 | Hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL CCP SS SR $710K Judge: CALENDAR CONTROL PART JUSTICE |
|
November 08, 2017 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED CALENDAR CONTROL PART Judge: CALENDAR CONTROL PART JUSTICE |
|
September 26, 2017 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED CALENDAR CONTROL PART Judge: CALENDAR CONTROL PART JUSTICE |
|
August 08, 2017 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED CALENDAR CONTROL PT RESERVE PRETRIAL RESERV Judge: CALENDAR CONTROL PART JUSTICE |
|
May 10, 2017 | Hearing |
REMAND PRETRIAL PART 47 Judge: JERRY GARGUILO |
|
May 03, 2017 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED PRETRIAL PART 47 Judge: JERRY GARGUILO |
|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) as to Dr. Kelly only |
|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) as to Dr. Raeder only |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.