Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-3, U.S. Bank National Association, As Successor Trustee To Wilmington Trust Company, As Successor Trustee To Bank Of America, National Association, Successor By Merger To Lasalle Bank National Association, As Trustee For Lehman Xs Trust, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Fourtner, Tracy Mckay, Hyman, Sarah Kristin, Polowy, Amy E., Strauss, Laura Marie, Vargas, Stephen John, (total of 6) See All against Cacv Of Colorado Llc, Capital One Bank Usa Na As Successor In Interest To Capital One Bank, Esther Pimentel, Hsbc Bank Nevada Na, Jeanette Gallo, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts Suffolk County Supreme Court with Randall Hinrichs presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 25, 2014 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1330 days |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseSuffolk County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1591 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: November 13, 2015ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 18, 2014JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: February 14, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 23, 2017ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: November 13, 2015ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002)
Date: August 01, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 25, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: August 01, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: August 01, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 10, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: November 13, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: November 13, 2015STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: August 29, 2017REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: August 08, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2018 | Hearing |
FORECLOSURE/FORM RECEIVED FIDUCIARY CLERK OFFICE NO SURPLUS 5/2/18 S/249,050 U/251,908 Judge: C. RANDALL HINRICHS |
|
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | |
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | |
April 25, 2018 | Hearing |
PD - ADJOURNED FORECLOSURE SALE DATE Judge: C. RANDALL HINRICHS |
|
April 13, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE | |
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002) | |
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | |
September 28, 2017 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #002) MOTION PART 49 ADJ PER STIP Judge: C. RANDALL HINRICHS |
|
August 29, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #002) | |
August 24, 2017 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) MOTION PART 49 ADJ PER STIP Judge: C. RANDALL HINRICHS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.