Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Bank Of America, National Association As Successor By Merger To Lasalle Bank National Association As Trustee For Wmalt 2005-11, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against Chung Im An, Country Glen Center Merchants, Inc, Helen Kim, Hsbc Bank Usa National Association, Interlude Home Inc, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts with Denise F. Molia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 08, 2021COUNTY CLERK MINUTES - PRIOR TO CONVERSION (SUBSEQUENT)
Date: January 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 12, 2021COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: January 08, 2021ORDER - WITH COUNTY CLERK DIRECTIVE
Date: March 10, 2021NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C)
Date: March 10, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE EF28 |
||
March 10, 2021 |
ORDER - WITH COUNTY CLERK DIRECTIVE Order (re: motion seq# 003) previously sent to cc (prior to efile conversion and not entered) |
||
March 10, 2021 | NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C) | ||
March 08, 2021 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Order was signed 2/7/20; but not entered |
||
January 22, 2021 |
COUNTY CLERK MINUTES - PRIOR TO CONVERSION (SUBSEQUENT) UPDATED |
||
January 08, 2021 |
ORDER - OTHER SO-ORDERED LETTER |
||
January 08, 2021 | COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.