Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Robert Capp, filed a(n) Discrimination - Labor and Employment case represented by Pulis, Kyle Thomas, against Jeannie Ellis Individually, Jeannie Ellis In Her Offical Capacity, Mark Hervan Individually, Mark Hervan In His Offical Capacity, New York State Department Of Transportation, (total of 8) See All represented by Hingerton, Patricia Mary, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph C Pastoressa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Employment Discrimination) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeDiscrimination |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - 44
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 47
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 55
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 45
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 46
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 50
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 70
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 71
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 64
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 48
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 65
Date: December 15, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: January 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 59
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 56
Date: December 15, 2021COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 58
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 54
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 42
Date: December 15, 2021MOTION PAPERS W/EXHIBITS (PRIOR TO CONVERSION)
Date: September 09, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: September 09, 2021CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: September 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Hingerton Affirm Exh. D-Demuth Affidavit Exhibits A-P
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 51
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 43
Date: December 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 66
Date: December 15, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: September 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 60
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 63
Date: December 15, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 68
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 62
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 69
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L
Date: September 09, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 02, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: April 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 67
Date: December 15, 2021CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: September 07, 2021NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: September 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: December 15, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 53
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 57
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 52
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 61
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22 2/5/07 Letter
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 30
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - M
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 24
Date: December 15, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 25
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 28
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 3/15/06 Letter
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 3/24/05 Letter
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 34
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 36
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 41
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 40
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 39
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 38
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 4/18/06 Letter
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 32
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 29
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 37
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 5/18/05 Letter
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 33
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 35
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 31
Date: December 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
April 14, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
January 18, 2022 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
December 15, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 44 Jeannie Ellis Complaints |
||
December 15, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 47 5/22/09 Email |
||
December 15, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 55 8/10/09 Email |
||
December 15, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 45 4/30/09 Email |
||
December 15, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 46 5/6/09 Email |
||
December 15, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 50 6/17/09 Email |
||
December 15, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 70 Peter Malvica NYSDHR Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.