Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Michael Perkowski, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Nemerov, Jeffrey A, against Brendan Rose, Patrice Rose, Richard Rose, Saint Anthony'S High School, represented by Mullen, Mary Catherine Teresa, Petrocelli, Richard Nicholas, Pustel, Helen B, Schondebare, James Arthur, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts Suffolk County Supreme Court with Joseph C Pastoressa presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 12, 2012 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuffolk County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1882 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 29, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: March 24, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 09, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001)
Date: September 22, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 31, 2012STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001)
Date: July 09, 2015STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: February 24, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: September 16, 2015ORDER - RECUSAL
Date: September 15, 2014STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: September 18, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 02, 2013STIPULATION - DISCOVERY
Date: April 24, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: September 26, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: September 22, 2015STIPULATION - DISCOVERY
Date: April 20, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: September 26, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: December 06, 2016STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: August 25, 2015STIPULATION - DISCOVERY
Date: August 25, 2016STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: February 06, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: March 16, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)
Date: September 22, 2015ANSWER
Date: February 11, 2013ANSWER
Date: January 10, 2013COMPLAINT
Date: December 12, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCOVERY | |
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) Affidavit of service |
|
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002) Order grants in camera review of deft recs/denies facebook auths |
|
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) Decides seq #002 & #003 |
|
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION (Motion #002) | |
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) | |
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Letter to plaintiff 09/19/16 |
|
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) letter to plaintiff 07/26/16 |
|
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.