Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Trustee For The Certificateholders Of The First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-Ff16, Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-Ff16, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Falasco, Todd C, Femminella, Nicole P, against Commissioner Of Taxation And Finance, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10, The Last Ten Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To The Plaintiff, The Person Or Parties Intended Being The Persons Or Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The, Pamela N Martinalbert, Ryan Sinnickson, Wiliam H Martinalbert, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts Suffolk County Supreme Court with Stephen M Behar presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 30, 2012 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseSuffolk County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time608 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: July 01, 2014RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 01, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 21, 2012AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 01, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 12, 2013STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 17, 2013STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 17, 2012STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 20, 2012DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 31, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 01, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2014 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) | |
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) | |
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) | |
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) | |
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) | |
March 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
|
March 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-WILIAM MARTINALBERT |
|
January 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
|
January 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-RYAN SINNICKSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.