Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Trustee On Behalf Of, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-He4, The Certificate Holders Of Ixis Real Estate Captial Trust 2004-He4, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Garret, Keith S., Landrigan, Kyle Edward, Weber-Cantrell, Jaclyn Ann, against Beneficial New York Inc., Denise Hancock, Montauk Automotive, Inc., Morganstern & Quatela, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. As Nominee For Guaranty Residential Lending Inc., (total of 11) See All represented by Brennan, Jennifer R., Rugino, Edward, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph C Pastoressa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 14, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 14, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: August 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: August 09, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Exhibit B - Recorded Assignment of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: August 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: August 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: August 09, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: August 09, 2021COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: June 14, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: April 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: August 09, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Exhibit A - Note & Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 09, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: September 13, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: August 09, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 23, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 05, 2022NOTICE OF SALE
Date: September 16, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED
Date: August 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 13, 2021NOTICE OF SALE
Date: February 03, 2023NOTICE OF SALE
Date: May 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2023 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
February 03, 2023 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
September 16, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
May 05, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter withdrawing OTSC |
||
April 29, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service re: Consent to Change Attorney |
||
April 29, 2022 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
November 23, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE 11 23 2021 Letter Faxed to Chambers |
||
October 20, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE 10 14 2021 Letter Faxed to Chambers for Adjournment on Consent |
||
September 28, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing for Notice of Conversion to E-Filing |
||
September 16, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.