Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Trustee For The Holders Of, Gsaa Home Equity Trust 2005-1, Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2005-1, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Christie, Monica G., Gazzo, Nicole Carol, Heaney, Alexandra Rose, Puscheck, Kathleen Elizabeth, against Marcy Gaynor, Midlund Funding Llc Doing Business In Ny As, Midlund Funding Llc Doing Business In Ny As, Midlund Funding Of Delaware Llc, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, As Nominee For, (total of 7) See All represented by Weiss, Ronald D., in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County, NY, . Suffolk County, NY Superior Courts with Robert F Quinlan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 16, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 16, 2021NOTICE OF SALE
Date: September 06, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 06, 2022CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: July 27, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: September 23, 2022COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: June 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: September 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: September 23, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 23, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: September 23, 2022NOTICE OF SALE
Date: March 03, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: September 23, 2022UNSIGNED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: September 26, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 26, 2022NOTICE
Date: March 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2023 | Notice of compliance for Surplus Monies Form | ||
September 26, 2022 | UNSIGNED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
September 26, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER SEQ. 005 OSC/DENIED |
||
September 23, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J EXHIBIT J |
||
September 23, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - K EXHIBIT K |
||
September 23, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A EXHIBIT A |
||
September 23, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP AFFIRMATION IN COMPLAINCE 24 HOUR NOTICE |
||
September 23, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP AFFIRMATION IN COMPLIANCE |
||
September 23, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B EXHIBIT B |
||
September 23, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C EXHIBIT C |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.