Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The Bank Of New York Mellon Fka The Bank Of New York As Trustee For The Benefit Of The Certificateholders Of The Cwabs Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2004-Ecc1, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Falasco, Todd C, Femminella, Nicole P, against Capital One Auto Finance, Inc, Capital One Bank Usa, Na, Citibank South Dakota, Na, Hsbc Bank Nevada, Na, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10, The Last Ten Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To The Plaintiff, The Person Or Parties Intended Being The Persons Or Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts Suffolk County Supreme Court with Foreclosure Conference Justice presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 10, 2012 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseSuffolk County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time526 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 27, 2012STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 25, 2012STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 18, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 26, 2012STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 05, 2012STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 05, 2012STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 08, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
February 18, 2014 | Docket Event | CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS | |
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION | |
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | |
October 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form |
|
October 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-Any and All |
|
October 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-"Jane" Ozturk (refused first name) as John Doe 1-tenant notice affidavit |
|
October 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization form |
|
October 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Affidavit of service-:Jane" Ozturk (refused first name) as John Doe 1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.