Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Us Bank National Association, As Trustee For Csfb Armt 2006-2, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Fusco, Emma Louise, Heaney, Alexandra Rose, Jurek, Amber Augustine, against Delmi Doe, Erica Doe, First United Mortgage Banking Corp., Luis Doe, Melitina Paz, (total of 13) See All in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts with John H Rouse presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 16, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #007)
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #007)
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #007)
Date: September 09, 2021COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: June 17, 2021CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: June 30, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 02, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 09, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #007)
Date: September 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #007)
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #007)
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #007)
Date: September 09, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #007)
Date: September 09, 2021ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: December 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #007)
Date: September 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2021 | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
November 10, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 09, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #007) Re-Filed Notice of Pendency |
||
September 09, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #007) Answer |
||
September 09, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #007) Motion for Summary Judgment |
||
September 09, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
September 09, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
September 09, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #007) Summons, Complaint, and Notice of Pendency |
||
September 09, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
September 09, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #007) Notice of Withdrawl |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.