Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts with PETER FOX COHALAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePETER FOX COHALAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time189 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2011 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) MOTION PART 24 ORAL 7/6/11 Judge: PETER FOX COHALAN |
|
June 08, 2011 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) MOTION PART 24 ORALARG Judge: PETER FOX COHALAN |
|
April 20, 2011 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) MOTION PART 24 ORALARG OSC Judge: PETER FOX COHALAN |
|
January 06, 2011 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) MOTION PART 24 ORALARG OSC Judge: PETER FOX COHALAN |
|
December 30, 2010 | Motion |
VACATE ORDER/JUDGMENT (Motion #001) Decided: 07/07/2011CASE DISPOSED Before Justice: PETER FOX COHALAN Answer demanded: No Judge: PETER FOX COHALAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.