Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kathy Ficara, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Carlson, Amanda Lynn, Quitko, Robin Meredith, against Charles Ficara, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts with Cheryl A Joseph presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCheryl A Joseph Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2021 | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER | ||
September 13, 2021 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
September 13, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
September 13, 2021 | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
September 13, 2021 | ADMISSION OF SERVICE | ||
September 13, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
July 01, 2021 | STIPULATION ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
July 01, 2021 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
June 30, 2021 | COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION | ||
June 29, 2021 | CONSENT TO EFILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.