Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Nationstar Mortgage, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Falasco, Todd C, Femminella, Nicole P, Kohn, Christopher Philip, Markgraf, Kent, Mindell, Morgan Drew, (total of 5) See All against Gabrielle Breitenbucher, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10, The Last Ten Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To The Plaintiff, The Person Or Parties Intended Being The Persons Or Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts with Ralph T Gazzillo presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2013 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1306 days |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Case Cycle Time1306 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 30, 2015ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 24, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2015AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2015AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2015RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: June 21, 2013NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: January 10, 2013AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 11, 2013AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 06, 2013EXHIBIT(S)  - d  (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 07, 2013AFFIRMATION
Date: June 21, 2013AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2015AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY Â (Motion #002) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: May 09, 2016NOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT)
Date: December 02, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2015BILL OF COSTS
Date: May 09, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 09, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 02, 2016FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: March 02, 2017NOTICE OF SALE
Date: September 19, 2016NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 07, 2016REFEREE REPORT OF SALE
Date: March 27, 2017FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: March 01, 2017NOTICE OF SALE
Date: January 27, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 07, 2016NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 02, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2015ORDER - WITH COUNTY CLERK DIRECTIVE
Date: January 27, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 07, 2013STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 06, 2013STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 11, 2013JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: August 08, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 09, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 09, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 24, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2017 | Hearing |
Surplus Money Date Post Judgment; NO SURPLUS 3/1/17, S/250,697 U/591,184 (Conversion) Judge: Gazzillo, Hon. Ralph T. |
|
October 02, 2017 | Hearing |
FORECLOSURE/FORM RECEIVED SURPLUS MONEY DATE NO SURPLUS 3/1/17 S/250,697 U/591,184 Judge: RALPH T. GAZZILLO |
|
May 01, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned Surplus Money Date Judge: Gazzillo, Hon. Ralph T. |
|
May 01, 2017 | Hearing |
PD - ADJOURNED SURPLUS MONEY DATE Judge: RALPH T. GAZZILLO |
|
March 27, 2017 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
March 02, 2017 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
March 01, 2017 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
January 27, 2017 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
October 17, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned Foreclosure Sale Date Judge: Gazzillo, Hon. Ralph T. |
|
October 17, 2016 | Hearing |
PD - ADJOURNED FORECLOSURE SALE DATE Judge: RALPH T. GAZZILLO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.