Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Kerry S. Bicksler, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hetznecker, Aubrey Davis, against Estate Of Kenneth R. Lewis, Sally A. Lewis, represented by Newman, Cindy, in the jurisdiction of Steuben County, NY, . Steuben County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 04, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSteuben County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of Steuben County, New York. The plaintiff, Kerry S. Bicksler, is suing the Estate of Kenneth R. Lewis and Sally A. Lewis. The plaintiff alleges that on October 14, 2020, he was operating his farm tractor...
ANSWER
Date: November 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 16, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: October 04, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: October 04, 2023SUMMONS
Date: October 04, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
November 20, 2023 | DEMAND FOR: | ||
October 16, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
||
October 10, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Sally A. Lewis |
||
October 04, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Decree and Letters of Administration |
||
October 04, 2023 | Complaint | ||
October 04, 2023 | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.