Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
M&T Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Knuckles, Mark R., Olson, Karen B., against John Doe Number One Through John Doe Number Ten, Joseph F Cordes, Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, represented by Bobseine, James E.B., in the jurisdiction of Steuben County, NY, . Steuben County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSteuben County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by M&T Bank against Joseph F. Cordes and the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development. The complaint seeks to foreclose on a mortgage given by Cordes to Fairport Savings Bank in the amount of $191,468.00...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 19, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 19, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 19, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 19, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 19, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 19, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: November 29, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 19, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: December 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: September 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: September 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: September 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: September 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: September 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: September 29, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: September 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: September 29, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: September 29, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 29, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2023 | NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
November 29, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
November 16, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 Joseph F. Cordes |
||
November 14, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS JOSEPH F. CORDES |
||
October 26, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM Secretary of housing urban development |
||
October 26, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Secretary of housing and urban development |
||
October 19, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS JOSEPH F. CORDES |
||
October 19, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 RHONDA CORDES AS JOHN DOE 1 |
||
October 19, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization Steuben |
||
October 19, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OM 10620 DAVIS HOLLOW ROAD COHOCTON NY 14826 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.