Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Chemung Canal Trust Company, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Defazio, Kimberlee Noelle, against Lonnie A Simons, in the jurisdiction of Steuben County, NY, . Steuben County, NY Superior Courts with Jason Cook presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSteuben County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Chemung Canal Trust Company against Lonnie A. Simons. The plaintiff, Chemung Canal Trust Company, is a New York State Banking Association with its principal place of business in Elmira, New York. The defend...
EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 07, 2023RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 07, 2023EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: November 07, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: November 14, 2023ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 07, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: October 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Past Due Notice Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: September 25, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: November 07, 2023ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)
Date: October 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: September 25, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 14, 2023 | ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | ||
November 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) bill of costs |
||
November 07, 2023 | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION | ||
November 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) affidavit of mailing |
||
November 07, 2023 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
November 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) affidavit of service |
||
November 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) statement for services |
||
November 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) summons and complaint |
||
November 07, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.