Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Lakeview Loan Servicing, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Lam, Fei F., against Darla M. Burton A K A Darla Burton, John And Or Jane Doe 1 Through John And Or Jane Doe 12, The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises Described In The Complaint, United States Of America, Acting Through The Rural Housing Service, in the jurisdiction of Steuben County, NY, . Steuben County, NY Superior Courts with Patrick F Mcallister presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSteuben County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure proceeding filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC against Darla M. Burton, also known as Darla Burton, and the United States of America acting through the Rural Housing Service. The complaint also includes John Doe and ...
John And Or Jane Doe 1 Through John And Or Jane Doe 12, The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises Described In The Complaint
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 16, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 26, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Corrected*
Date: October 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 25, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 10, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 16, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: January 10, 2024RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 10, 2024NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: September 25, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: September 25, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2024 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
January 11, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 10, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit to RJI - All Affidavits of Service |
||
January 10, 2024 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
January 10, 2024 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
October 25, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Corrected* ATTY GENERAL USA AFF |
||
October 25, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE USA RURAL HOUSING AFF |
||
October 25, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 3215 AFF |
||
October 16, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 1303 AFF |
||
October 16, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING EFILE AUTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.