Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Gazzo, Nicole Carol, Goldberg, Brian David, Pascuzzi, Ashley Marie, Polowy, Amy E., Rooney, Anthony J., (total of 5) See All against Brian D. Scott, Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Hsbc Bank Nevada, N.A., Chemung Canal Trust Company, John Doe, Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Mcglenn, John R., in the jurisdiction of Steuben County, NY, . Steuben County, NY Superior Courts with Patrick F Mcallister presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 18, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSteuben County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC against Brian D. Scott and other defendants. The plaintiff alleges that Brian D. Scott failed to comply with the conditions of the note and mortgage by not making the payment due...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 05, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIDAVIT non military affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 22, 2024LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: October 17, 2023SUPPORTING PLEADINGS
Date: October 17, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: October 17, 2023RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: October 17, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 05, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 18, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 18, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT non military affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR non military affidavit Redacted |
||
October 17, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
October 17, 2023 | SUPPORTING PLEADINGS | ||
October 17, 2023 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
October 17, 2023 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
October 10, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
October 05, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS CHEMUNG CANAL TRUST COMPANY |
||
October 05, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Trevor Scott s/h/a JOHN DOE #1 |
||
October 05, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 05, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS BRIAN D. SCOTT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.