Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Scully, James Paul, against Jodi Prete, in the jurisdiction of Steuben County, NY, . Steuben County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSteuben County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
This complaint is filed by Discover Bank against Jodi Prete in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Steuben. Discover Bank alleges that Jodi Prete entered into a credit card agreement with Discover Bank, and under the terms of the ag...
AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 22, 2024JUDGMENT
Date: January 24, 2024AFFIRMATION
Date: January 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 22, 2024JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: January 22, 2024AFFIRMATION
Date: January 22, 2024ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)
Date: October 06, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 20, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2024 | JUDGMENT | ||
January 22, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OF ORIGINAL CREDITOR | ||
January 22, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION |
||
January 22, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A INVOICE FOR SERVICE |
||
January 22, 2024 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
January 22, 2024 | AFFIRMATION OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | ||
October 06, 2023 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
September 20, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 20, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 05, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.