Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Us Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Falasco, Todd C, Manfredi, Linda P., Tremaroli, Robert Steven, against Capital One Bank Usa Na, Citibank South Dakota Na, Corning Hospital, Discover Bank, Donald Smith, (total of 18) See All in the jurisdiction of Steuben County, NY, . Steuben County, NY Superior Courts Steuben County Supreme Court with Patrick F Mcallister presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 12, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSteuben County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseSteuben County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Certificate of Merit Attached Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 12, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: April 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #3) Notice of Pendency Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - Y Â (Motion #3) Vacancy Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #2) Affidavit of vacancy Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2) Notice of Pendency Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 28, 2022JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: August 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 30, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #2) Affidavit of Merit Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 30, 2020NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 12, 2020EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: January 11, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: July 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 28, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 28, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2) Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 20, 2022FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: December 01, 2022NOTICE OF SALE
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2) Assignment Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 30, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2) Department of Defense Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: July 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2) Notice of Default Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3) Assignment Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 28, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY 2ND LP Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1) Legal Description Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 31, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3) Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #3) 90 day notice Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1) Due Diligence Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 11, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 30, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #3) Supplemental Summons Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2) Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 13, 2022REFEREE REPORT OF SALE
Date: December 13, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 20, 2022BILL OF COSTS Â (Motion #3) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 28, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2) 90 day Notice Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1) Amended Pleadings Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 11, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: May 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A legal description Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 29, 2021SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: March 29, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY (AMENDED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #3) Amended Notice of Pendency Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 28, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: April 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #2) Supplemental Summons Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 20, 2022REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE Â (Motion #3) *Corrected*
Date: July 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #2) Non Military Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 18, 2022COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: March 29, 2021REPORT OF GUARDIAN
Date: April 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3) Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 28, 2022NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C)
Date: March 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: January 11, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: January 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 11, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1) *Corrected* Vacancy Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 11, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #3) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 20, 2022ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: May 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Z Â (Motion #3) Loan Modification Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #2) Amended Notice of Pendency Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 20, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 28, 2022ORDER - APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Date: March 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #3) Department of Defense Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1) Death Certificate Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 11, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: May 28, 2021ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: January 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #3) *Corrected*
Date: July 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2) Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #3) Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3) *Corrected*
Date: July 28, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 17, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
December 13, 2022 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
December 01, 2022 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
October 18, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
October 18, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 14, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
October 14, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
August 26, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
July 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #3) Notice of Pendency Redacted per 22 NYCRR Notice of Pendency Redacted |
||
July 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - Y (Motion #3) Vacancy Affidavit Redacted per 22 NYCRR Vacancy Affidavit Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.