Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Larry Allison, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Telaak, Jason M., against Leland Dehart, represented by Karambelkar, Aalok J., in the jurisdiction of Steuben County, NY, . Steuben County, NY Superior Courts Steuben County Supreme Court with Robert B Wiggins presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 11, 2017 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSteuben County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseSteuben County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time512 days |
ANSWER
Date: January 29, 2018ORDER - MEDIATION
Date: December 21, 2018STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 07, 2019STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: September 11, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 11, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE FOR MEDIATION | |
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE MEDIATION CONFERENCE NOTICE |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - MEDIATION | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | |
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - OTHER | |
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Certified Mail receipts |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.