Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Carolyn A Lyke, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Zink, Colleen G., against John K Lyke, in the jurisdiction of Steuben County, NY, . Steuben County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2022 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSteuben County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
December 21, 2022 | STIPULATION - OTHER | ||
December 21, 2022 | AMENDED JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
December 21, 2022 | CONSENT TO EFILING | ||
December 21, 2022 | COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION | ||
July 19, 2012 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
November 29, 2011 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
November 29, 2011 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
November 29, 2011 | NOTICE | ||
November 21, 2011 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.